Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Tomás Iturralde (Yturralde)

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ibarra, Ecuador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jun 1807Born
1831¹23.5Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jun 186962.0AppointedBishop of Ibarra, Ecuador
13 Feb 187062.6Ordained BishopBishop of Ibarra, Ecuador
1 Jul 187669.0ResignedBishop of Ibarra, Ecuador
1888¹80.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Ibarra, Ecuador

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Tomás Iturralde (Yturralde)
Bishop Antonio Tomás Iturralde (Yturralde) (born , died 1888) Bishop Emeritus of Ibarra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAmbato, Archdiocese of Quito
Ordained BishopQuito, Archdiocese of Quito

  • a priest for 57.0 years
  • a bishop for 17.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 318
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1870, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 11 Apr 2017