Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vicente Felicísimo Maya Guzmán

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Machala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Sep 1911BornAtuntaqui-Imbabura
4 Jul 193725.7Ordained PriestPriest
29 Nov 196352.1AppointedPrelate of El Oro, Ecuador
29 Nov 196352.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Comana Pontica
2 Feb 196452.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Comana Pontica
31 Jan 196957.3AppointedBishop of Machala, Ecuador
30 Jan 197866.3ResignedBishop of Machala, Ecuador
19 Sep 198069.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Machala, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Vicente Felicísimo Maya Guzmán:
Bishop Vicente Felicísimo Maya Guzmán (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Machala

  • a priest for 43.2 years
  • a bishop for 16.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015