Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Vicariate Apostolic of Napo

Vicariatus Apostolicus Napensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Adelio Pasqualotto, C.S.I., Vicar Apostolic
  • Paolo Mietto, C.S.I., Vicar Apostolic Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Vicariate Apostolic
  • Erected: 7 February 1871
  • Vicariate
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Ecuador
  • Square Kilometers: 24,600 (9,501 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Mision Josefina, Calle Juan Montalvo, Tena, Napo, Ecuador
  • Telephone: (06)2886-422; 2886.805
  • Fax: 2886.805

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
7 February 1871ErectedArchdiocese of Quito Vicariate Apostolic of Napo (erected)
4 October 1886Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Napo Prefecture Apostolic of Canelos e Macas (erected)
17 February 1893Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Napo Vicariate Apostolic of Méndez y Gualaquiza (erected)
17 February 1893Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Napo Vicariate Apostolic of Zamora (erected)
16 April 1924Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Napo Prefecture Apostolic of San Miguel de Sucumbíos (erected)
16 November 1953Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Napo Prefecture Apostolic of Aguarico (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
195020,00022,00090.9%13131,53828265ap1951
196628,00030,00093.3%222241,166336113ap1967
196825250386815ap1971
197641,00045,00091.1%127281,464367622ap1977
198049,00053,00092.5%28281,750367316ap1981
199071,33082,31586.7%124252,853316218ap1991
199990,252104,96886.0%422263,471267620ap2000
200093,037108,88485.4%521263,578267719ap2001
200192,041107,25185.8%521263,540267419ap2002
200293,069109,06985.3%417214,431237419ap2003
200386,837103,49783.9%619253,4731237219ap2004
200482,92399,24283.6%521263,189266919ap2005
201097,000111,00087.4%1016263,730205520ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_d, v3.0.3, 15 Nov 2014; Data: 18 Dec 2014