Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jesús Esteban Sádaba Pérez, O.F.M. Cap.

Vicar Apostolic of Aguarico

Titular Bishop of Assuras


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Oct 1941 BornPamplona, Spain
3 Apr 196523.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
22 Jan 199048.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Aguarico, Ecuador
22 Jan 199048.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Assuras
3 Apr 199048.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Assuras

MicroData Summary for Jesús Esteban Sádaba Pérez:
Bishop Jesús Esteban Sádaba Pérez O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Vicar Apostolic of Aguarico

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Aguarico.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121, Number 10,866

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013