Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Félix Pintado Blasco, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Méndez

Titular Bishop of Phoba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 May 1903BornHuesca, Spain
19 Apr 193026.9Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
13 Nov 195855.5AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Méndez, Ecuador
13 Nov 195855.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Phoba
5 Apr 195955.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Phoba
17 Aug 196360.2SucceededVicar Apostolic of Méndez, Ecuador
24 Jan 198177.7RetiredVicar Apostolic of Méndez, Ecuador
19 Nov 198784.5DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Méndez, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for José Félix Pintado Blasco:
Bishop José Félix Pintado Blasco S.D.B. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Méndez

  • a priest for 57.6 years
  • a bishop for 28.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1959, Number 28
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 174, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013