Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Victor Alejandro Corral Mantilla

Bishop Emeritus of Riobamba, Ecuador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Feb 1936 Born
15 Jul 196024.4Ordained PriestPriest
14 Jan 198245.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Riobamba, Ecuador
14 Jan 198245.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Gummi in Proconsulari
14 Feb 198245.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gummi in Proconsulari
4 Sep 198751.5AppointedBishop of Riobamba, Ecuador
28 Feb 201175.0RetiredBishop of Riobamba, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Victor Alejandro Corral Mantilla
Bishop Victor Alejandro Corral Mantilla (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Riobamba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGuayaquil

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Riobamba.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 28 Feb 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018