Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Néstor Rafael Herrera Heredia

Bishop Emeritus of Machala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Oct 1933 BornPujili
21 Jul 195723.7Ordained PriestPriest
14 Jan 198248.2AppointedBishop of Machala, Ecuador
14 Feb 198248.3Ordained BishopBishop of Machala, Ecuador
22 Feb 201076.3RetiredBishop of Machala, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Néstor Rafael Herrera Heredia:
Bishop Néstor Rafael Herrera Heredia (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Machala

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Machala.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 22 Feb 2010

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013