Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Segundo René Coba Galarza

Bishop of Ibarra, Ecuador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Sep 1957 Born
3 Jul 198224.7Ordained PriestPriest of Quito, Ecuador
7 Jun 200648.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Quito, Ecuador
7 Jun 200648.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Vegesela in Byzacena
11 Aug 200648.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vegesela in Byzacena
18 Jun 201456.7AppointedBishop of Ecuador, Military
12 Dec 201962.2AppointedBishop of Ibarra, Ecuador
1 Feb 202062.3InstalledBishop of Ibarra, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Segundo René Coba Galarza
Bishop Segundo René Coba Galarza (born ) Bishop of Ibarra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceQuito, Archdiocese of Quito
Ordained BishopCathedral, Quito, Archdiocese of Quito

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ibarra.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Jun 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Number 15,219
  • ab: Bollettino, 18 Jun 2014
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 Dec 2019
  • i: CB, 13 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast