Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hermenegildo José Torres Asanza

Bishop of Guaranda, Ecuador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jun 1966 Born
12 Jul 199226.1Ordained PriestPriest of Machala, Ecuador
30 Oct 200741.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Machala, Ecuador
30 Oct 200741.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Centenaria
12 Dec 200741.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Centenaria
22 Oct 201246.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Machala, Ecuador
14 Sep 201347.2CeasedApostolic Administrator of Machala, Ecuador
4 Oct 201852.3AppointedBishop of Guaranda, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Hermenegildo José Torres Asanza
Bishop Hermenegildo José Torres Asanza (born ) Bishop of Guaranda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Roque, Diocese of Machala
Ordained BishopCathedral, Machala, Diocese of Machala

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Guaranda.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Oct 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Number 15,577
  • ab: CB, 22 Oct 2012
  • ab: Bollettino, 4 Oct 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.1, 12 Sep 2018; Data: 4 Oct 2018

Quantcast