Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vicente Horacio Saeteros Sierra

Auxiliary Bishop of Portoviejo, Ecuador

Titular Bishop of Rusuccuru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Apr 1968 Born
25 Mar 200031.9Ordained PriestPriest of Portoviejo, Ecuador
16 May 202052.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Portoviejo, Ecuador
16 May 202052.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Rusuccuru
15 Aug 202052.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rusuccuru

MicroData Summary for Vicente Horacio Saeteros Sierra
Bishop Vicente Horacio Saeteros Sierra (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Portoviejo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Ana, Diocese of Portoviejo (Porto Vecchio)
Ordained BishopPortoviejo, Archdiocese of Portoviejo

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Portoviejo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 May 2020
  • ob: CB, 18 May 2020
  • c2+: CB, 14 Aug 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 15 Aug 2020

Quantcast