Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Adriaan Smets

Deceased

Apostolic Delegate Emeritus to Persia

Titular Archbishop of Gangra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Aug 1867Born
24 Sep 189225.0Ordained PriestPriest
13 Jan 192254.3AppointedApostolic Delegate to Persia
2 Aug 192254.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Gangra
28 Oct 192255.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Gangra
1930²62.3ResignedApostolic Delegate to Persia
31 Jul 194779.9DiedApostolic Delegate Emeritus to Persia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Adriaan Smets
Archbishop Adriaan Smets (born , died ) Apostolic Delegate Emeritus of Persia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDommelen, Netherlands

  • a priest for 54.8 years
  • a bishop for 24.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1948
  • op/ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1922, Number 66

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018