Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jules Tiberghien

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Nicaea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1867BornTourcoing, France
Jun 1892³24.4Ordained PriestPriest
21 Nov 192153.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nicaea
8 Dec 192154.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nicaea
3 Jan 192355.0DiedTitular Archbishop of Nicaea

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jules Tiberghien:
Archbishop Jules Tiberghien (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Nicaea

  • a priest for 30.5 years
  • a bishop for 1.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1921, Number 92

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015