Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop François Lesné, C.M. †

Deceased

Apostolic Delegate to Persia

Titular Archbishop of Philippopolis in Thracia

Apostolic Administrator of Ispahan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Aug 1846Born
1868¹21.3ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Mission
20 Apr 189649.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Philippopolis in Thracia
20 Apr 189649.6AppointedApostolic Delegate to Persia
20 Apr 189649.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Ispahan, Iran
28 Jun 189649.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Philippopolis in Thracia
11 Feb 191063.5DiedApostolic Delegate to Persia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François Lesné
Archbishop François Lesné C.M. (born , died ) Apostolic Delegate of Persia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMaroué, France
Ordained Bishop95, rue de Sevres, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France

  • a bishop for 13.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 453
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1896, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017