Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Germán Medina Acosta

Auxiliary Bishop of Bogotá, Colombia

Titular Bishop of Aradi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Feb 1958 Born
11 Jun 198325.2Ordained PriestPriest of Bogotá, Colombia
11 Jun 202163.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bogotá, Colombia
11 Jun 202163.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Aradi
14 Aug 202163.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aradi

MicroData Summary for Germán Medina Acosta
Bishop Germán Medina Acosta (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Bogotá

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBogotá, Archdiocese of Bogotá
Ordained BishopCathedral, Bogotá, Archdiocese of Bogotá

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Bogotá.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Jun 2021
  • op/c1: CB, 11 Jun 2021
  • ob: CB, 2 Jul 2021
  • c2+: CB, 14 Aug 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 15 Aug 2021

Quantcast