Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fernando Martín Croxatto

Bishop of Neuquén, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Sep 1956 Born
15 Mar 198629.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Buenos Aires, Argentina
6 Dec 198630.1Ordained PriestPriest of Buenos Aires, Argentina
2000²43.2IncardinatedPriest of San Roque de Presidencia Roque Sáenz Peña, Argentina
13 Mar 201457.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Comodoro Rivadavia, Argentina
13 Mar 201457.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Fissiana
17 May 201457.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Fissiana
3 Aug 201760.8AppointedBishop of Neuquén, Argentina
22 Sep 201760.9InstalledBishop of Neuquén, Argentina

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Fernando Martín Croxatto
Bishop Fernando Martín Croxatto (born ) Bishop of Neuquén

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMorón
Ordained BishopAtrium of San Roque, Cathedral, Presidencia Roque Sáenz Peña, Diocese of San Roque de Presidencia Roque Sáenz Peña

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Neuquén.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 Mar 2014
  • od/c01: CB, 13 Mar 2014
  • ob: CB, 31 Mar 2014
  • c2+: CB, 3 Apr 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 218, Number 18,161
  • ab: Bollettino, 3 Aug 2017
  • i: CB, 19 Aug 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 23 Aug 2017