Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joaquín Gimeno Lahoz

Bishop of Comodoro Rivadavia, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Oct 1948 Born
29 Jun 197324.7Ordained PriestPriest of Teruel (-Albarracín), Spain
15 Jul 201061.7AppointedBishop of Comodoro Rivadavia, Argentina
15 Oct 201062.0Ordained BishopBishop of Comodoro Rivadavia, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Joaquín Gimeno Lahoz
Bishop Joaquín Gimeno Lahoz (born ) Bishop of Comodoro Rivadavia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Mata de Olmos, Spain

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Comodoro Rivadavia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Jul 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Number 16,860

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 23 Aug 2017