Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Lorenzo Sartori

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of San Roque de Presidencia Roque Sáenz Peña, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 May 1932Born
2 Dec 195624.5Ordained PriestPriest
27 Aug 199462.2AppointedBishop of San Roque de Presidencia Roque Sáenz Peña, Argentina
19 Nov 199462.4Ordained BishopBishop of San Roque de Presidencia Roque Sáenz Peña, Argentina
22 Apr 200875.9RetiredBishop of San Roque de Presidencia Roque Sáenz Peña, Argentina
2 Oct 201886.3DiedBishop Emeritus of San Roque de Presidencia Roque Sáenz Peña, Argentina

MicroData Summary for José Lorenzo Sartori
Bishop José Lorenzo Sartori (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of San Roque de Presidencia Roque Sáenz Peña

EventPlace
Birth PlaceConcepción del Uruguay
Ordained PriestSeminario de Villa Devoto, Chapel, Buenos Aires, Archdiocese of Buenos Aires
Ordained BishopSan Roque, Cathedral, Presidencia Roque Sáenz Peña, Diocese of San Roque de Presidencia Roque Sáenz Peña
Death PlaceChaco, Diocese of San Roque de Presidencia Roque Sáenz Peña

  • a priest for 61.8 years
  • a bishop for 23.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 22 Apr 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,450
  • d: CB, 2 Oct 2018
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 238, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast