Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Abelardo Francisco Silva

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of San Miguel


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jul 1924Born
24 Sep 195531.2Ordained PriestPriest
28 Oct 198157.3AppointedBishop of Presidencia Roque Sáenz Peña, Argentina
8 Dec 198157.4Ordained BishopBishop of Presidencia Roque Sáenz Peña, Argentina
20 Dec 198157.4InstalledBishop of Presidencia Roque Sáenz Peña, Argentina
31 Mar 199469.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of San Miguel, Argentina
8 May 199469.8InstalledCoadjutor Bishop of San Miguel, Argentina
12 Nov 199470.3SucceededBishop of San Miguel, Argentina
17 May 200075.8RetiredBishop of San Miguel, Argentina
15 Jul 200581.0DiedBishop Emeritus of San Miguel, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Abelardo Francisco Silva:
Bishop Abelardo Francisco Silva (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of San Miguel

  • a priest for 49.8 years
  • a bishop for 23.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013