Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel Mykycej, F.D.P.

Bishop Emeritus of Santa María del Patrocinio en Buenos Aires (Ukrainian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Oct 1934 BornHorocholyna, Ukraine
11 Feb 196126.3Solemn ProfessedMember of Sons of Divine Providence
21 Apr 196328.5Ordained PriestPriest of Sons of Divine Providence
23 Jun 199055.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santa María del Patrocinio en Buenos Aires (Ukrainian), Argentina
23 Jun 199055.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Nazianzus
14 Oct 199055.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nazianzus
20 Jan 199863.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Santa María del Patrocinio en Buenos Aires (Ukrainian), Argentina
24 Apr 199964.5AppointedBishop of Santa María del Patrocinio en Buenos Aires (Ukrainian), Argentina
25 Jul 199964.7InstalledBishop of Santa María del Patrocinio en Buenos Aires (Ukrainian), Argentina
10 Apr 201075.4RetiredBishop of Santa María del Patrocinio en Buenos Aires (Ukrainian), Argentina

MicroData Summary for Miguel Mykycej:
Bishop Miguel Mykycej F.D.P. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Santa María del Patrocinio en Buenos Aires

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Santa María del Patrocinio en Buenos Aires (Ukrainian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 10 Apr 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127, Number 11,432
  • sole: CB, 20 Jan 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 20 Jan 2015