Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrés Sapelak, S.D.B.

Bishop Emeritus of Santa María del Patrocinio en Buenos Aires (Ukrainian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1919 BornRyszkowa Wole, Poland
29 Jun 194929.5Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
14 Aug 196141.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Argentina, Faithful of the Eastern Rites
14 Aug 196141.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Sebastopolis in Thracia
15 Oct 196141.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sebastopolis in Thracia
9 Feb 196848.2AppointedArchiepiscopal Exarch of Argentina (Ukrainian)
24 Apr 197858.4AppointedBishop of Santa María del Patrocinio en Buenos Aires (Ukrainian), Argentina
12 Dec 199778.0RetiredBishop of Santa María del Patrocinio en Buenos Aires (Ukrainian), Argentina

MicroData Summary for Andrés Sapelak:
Bishop Andrés Sapelak S.D.B. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Santa María del Patrocinio en Buenos Aires

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Santa María del Patrocinio en Buenos Aires (Ukrainian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013