Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Volodymyr Hrutsa, C.SS.R.

Auxiliary Bishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine

Titular Bishop of Bahanna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Aug 1976 Born
19 Aug 199519.0ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
19 Aug 200024.0Perpetual VowsMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
12 Jul 200124.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
14 Jan 201639.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
14 Jan 201639.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Bahanna
7 Apr 201639.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bahanna

MicroData Summary for Volodymyr Hrutsa
Bishop Volodymyr Hrutsa C.SS.R. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lviv

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDobromyl

Please contact the Bishop through the Archeparchy of Lviv (Ukrainian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Jan 2016
  • prof/perp: CB, 14 Jan 2016
  • c1: CB, 15 Jan 2016
  • ob/c2: CB, 4 Feb 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 228, Number 18,891

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast