Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archeparchy of São João Batista em Curitiba (Ukrainian)

Sancti Ioannis Baptistae Curitibensis Ucrainorum



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Valdomiro Koubetch, O.S.B.M., Archbishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Apostolic Exarchate of Brazil (Ukrainian)
30 May 1962ErectedApostolic Exarchate of Brazil (Ukrainian) (erected)
Eparchy of São João Batista em Curitiba (Ukrainian)
29 November 1971ElevatedApostolic Exarchate of Brazil (Ukrainian) Eparchy of São João Batista em Curitiba (Ukrainian)
12 May 2014Territory LostEparchy of São João Batista em Curitiba (Ukrainian) Eparchy of Imaculada Conceição in Prudentópolis (Ukrainian) (erected)
Archeparchy of São João Batista em Curitiba (Ukrainian)
12 May 2014ElevatedEparchy of São João Batista em Curitiba (Ukrainian) Archeparchy of São João Batista em Curitiba (Ukrainian)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Apostolic Exarchate of Brazil (Ukrainian)
196699,000937462,1528838215ap1967
196895,000110,00086.4%836442,1596543213ap1971
Eparchy of São João Batista em Curitiba (Ukrainian)
1976136,213940492,77916332317ap1977
198096,640938472,05616439718ap1981
1990130,0001547622,09618845321ap1991
1998162,0001553682,38219143625ap2001
1999162,0001553682,38219143625ap2000
2001162,0001350632,57128944622ap2002
2002161,5001552672,41028945822ap2003
2003161,5001855732,21229246022ap2004
2004161,5002057772,09729645623ap2005
2009162,0002265871,86228648523ap2010
2010162,00021801011,603210246423ap2011
Archeparchy of São João Batista em Curitiba (Ukrainian)

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 27 Jun 2014