Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Romão Martenetz, O.S.B.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of São João Batista em Curitiba (Ukrainian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Feb 1903BornLviv
24 Aug 192421.5ProfessedMember of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
9 Oct 192724.6Solemn ProfessedMember of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
1 Jan 192824.9Ordained PriestPriest of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
10 May 195855.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Brazil, Faithful of the Eastern Rites
10 May 195855.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Soldaia
15 Aug 195855.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Soldaia
30 May 196259.3AppointedApostolic Exarch of Brazil (Ukrainian)
29 Nov 197168.8AppointedBishop of São João Batista em Curitiba (Ukrainian), Brazil
10 Mar 197875.0RetiredBishop of São João Batista em Curitiba (Ukrainian), Brazil
23 Feb 198986.0DiedBishop Emeritus of São João Batista em Curitiba (Ukrainian), Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Romão Martenetz:
Bishop José Romão Martenetz O.S.B.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of São João Batista em Curitiba

  • a priest for 61.1 years
  • a bishop for 30.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120
  • sole/c1: CB, 20 Jan 2015
  • prof: CB, 25 Feb 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 1 Mar 2015