Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Daniel Kozelinski Netto

Apostolic Administrator of Santa María del Patrocinio en Buenos Aires (Ukrainian)

Titular Bishop of Eminentiana

Auxiliary Bishop of São João Batista em Curitiba (Ukrainian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Feb 1952 BornColonia Paraiso
21 Nov 197927.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of São João Batista em Curitiba (Ukrainian), Brazil
10 Feb 198027.9Ordained PriestPriest of São João Batista em Curitiba (Ukrainian), Brazil
20 Jun 200755.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São João Batista em Curitiba (Ukrainian), Brazil
20 Jun 200755.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Eminentiana
16 Sep 200755.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Eminentiana
22 Jun 201159.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Santa María del Patrocinio en Buenos Aires (Ukrainian), Argentina
2 Oct 201159.6InstalledApostolic Administrator of Santa María del Patrocinio en Buenos Aires (Ukrainian), Argentina

MicroData Summary for Daniel Kozelinski Netto:
Bishop Daniel Kozelinski Netto (born ) Apostolic Administrator of Santa María del Patrocinio en Buenos Aires

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Santa María del Patrocinio en Buenos Aires (Ukrainian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 Jun 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Number 15,512
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 Jun 2011
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 Jan 2013
  • op/i: CB, 20 Jan 2015
  • od/c0: CB, 6 Feb 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 7 Feb 2015