Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Agustín Boneo

Deceased

Bishop of Santa Fe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jun 1845BornBuenos Aires
19 Sep 186823.3Ordained PriestPriest of Buenos Aires, Argentina
15 Jun 189348.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
15 Jun 189348.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Arsinoë in Arcadia
22 Oct 189348.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arsinoë in Arcadia
7 Feb 189852.7AppointedBishop of Santa Fe, Argentina
24 Mar 189852.8InstalledBishop of Santa Fe, Argentina
16 Jun 193287.0DiedBishop of Santa Fe, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Juan Agustín Boneo:
Bishop Juan Agustín Boneo (born , died ) Bishop of Santa Fe

  • a priest for 63.7 years
  • a bishop for 38.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,719
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 124, and Page 271

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013