Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Benito Salvador de la Reta

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of San Juan de Cuyo, Argentina

Titular Bishop of Claudiopolis in Isauria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Mar 1831Born
1855¹23.7Ordained PriestPriest
18 Nov 188150.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Juan de Cuyo, Argentina
18 Nov 188150.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Claudiopolis in Isauria
19 Mar 188250.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Claudiopolis in Isauria
21 Jan 189765.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of San Juan de Cuyo, Argentina

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Benito Salvador de la Reta
Bishop José Benito Salvador de la Reta (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of San Juan de Cuyo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMendoza
Ordained BishopSan Nicolás, Mendoza

  • a priest for 42.0 years
  • a bishop for 14.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,715
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 209
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1882, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Apr 2017