Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Tomás Juan Carlos Solari

Deceased

Archbishop of La Plata, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Mar 1899Born
19 Apr 192425.0Ordained PriestPriest of Buenos Aires, Argentina
23 Aug 194344.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
23 Aug 194344.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Aulon
11 Nov 194344.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aulon
20 Sep 194849.4AppointedArchbishop of La Plata, Argentina
11 Nov 194849.6InstalledArchbishop of La Plata, Argentina
13 May 195455.1DiedArchbishop of La Plata, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Tomás Juan Carlos Solari
Archbishop Tomás Juan Carlos Solari (born , died ) Archbishop of La Plata

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuenos Aires

  • a priest for 30.0 years
  • a bishop for 10.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1943, Number 71

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast