Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Liberato Tosti

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Nicaragua

Titular Archbishop of Leucas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 May 1883BornOriolo Romano
18 Apr 190824.9Ordained PriestPriest
5 Sep 194663.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Leucas
5 Sep 194663.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Paraguay
3 Nov 194663.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Leucas
4 Oct 194865.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Nicaragua
4 Oct 194865.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Honduras
1949²65.6ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Nicaragua
1949²65.6ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Honduras
20 Oct 195067.4DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Nicaragua

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Liberato Tosti:
Archbishop Liberato Tosti (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Nicaragua

  • a priest for 42.5 years
  • a bishop for 4.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1946, Number 95
  • appt/xxpy: Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 38, Page 407

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013