Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Alejandro W. Bunge

President of the Labour Office of the Apostolic See

Priest of San Isidro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Nov 1951 Born
23 Dec 197827.0Ordained PriestPriest of San Isidro, Argentina
1 Oct 202068.8AppointedPresident of the Labour Office of the Apostolic See

MicroData Summary for Alejandro W. Bunge (VIAF: 55931602)
Father Alejandro W. Bunge (born ) President of Labour Office of the Apostolic See

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuenos Aires, Archdiocese of Buenos Aires, Argentina

Please contact the Father through the Labour Office of the Apostolic See.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 1 Oct 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 9 Oct 2020

Quantcast