Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alberto Deane, C.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Villa María, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 May 1908Born
28 Apr 193324.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Passion
13 Mar 195748.8AppointedBishop of Villa María, Argentina
29 Jun 195749.1Ordained BishopBishop of Villa María, Argentina
4 Jul 195749.1InstalledBishop of Villa María, Argentina
15 Apr 197768.9ResignedBishop of Villa María, Argentina
15 Sep 198577.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Villa María, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Alberto Deane
Bishop Alberto Deane C.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Villa María

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArrecifes

  • a priest for 52.3 years
  • a bishop for 28.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018