Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Azamor y Ramírez

Deceased

Bishop of Buenos Aires


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Oct 1733BornVillablanca, Spain
27 Jan 178551.2SelectedBishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
27 Jun 178551.6ConfirmedBishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
15 Oct 178652.9Ordained BishopBishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
2 Oct 179662.9DiedBishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Manuel Azamor y Ramírez:
Bishop Manuel Azamor y Ramírez (born , died ) Bishop of Buenos Aires

  • a bishop for 9.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 105, Number 542

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015