Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Escalzo y Miguel, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cádiz


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Oct 1718³BornSesma
18 Jul 178364.7AppointedBishop of Cádiz, Spain
17 Aug 178364.8Ordained BishopBishop of Cádiz, Spain
17 Mar 179071.4DiedBishop of Cádiz, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Escalzo y Miguel:
Bishop José Escalzo y Miguel O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Cádiz

  • a bishop for 6.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 222
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 100, Number 518
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1783, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 1 Jan 2016