Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrés José Barco Espinosa

Deceased

Bishop of Salamanca, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Nov 1726Born
27 Jun 178558.6AppointedBishop of Salamanca, Spain
28 Aug 178558.8Ordained BishopBishop of Salamanca, Spain
17 Apr 179467.4DiedBishop of Salamanca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Andrés José Barco Espinosa
Bishop Andrés José Barco Espinosa (born , died ) Bishop of Salamanca

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalma del Río

  • a bishop for 8.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 103, Number 536
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1785, Number 48
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 362

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018