Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartolomé Antonio Fernández Sobrado, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ceuta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1733BornBenaocaz
19 Dec 178552.3AppointedBishop of Ceuta, Spain
19 Mar 178652.5Ordained BishopBishop of Ceuta, Spain
Dec 1811³78.2DiedBishop of Ceuta, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bartolomé Antonio Fernández Sobrado:
Bishop Bartolomé Antonio Fernández Sobrado O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Bishop of Ceuta

  • a bishop for 25.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 105, Number 960

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015