Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jorge Luis Lona

Bishop Emeritus of San Luis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Nov 1935 BornBuenos Aires
20 Dec 197944.1Ordained PriestPriest of San Juan de Cuyo, Argentina
20 Nov 200065.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of San Luis, Argentina
20 Dec 200065.1Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of San Luis, Argentina
6 Jun 200165.5SucceededBishop of San Luis, Argentina
22 Feb 201175.2RetiredBishop of San Luis, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Jorge Luis Lona:
Bishop Jorge Luis Lona (born ) Bishop Emeritus of San Luis

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Luis.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 22 Feb 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 161, Number 13,870

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013