Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriel de Arregui y Gutiérrez, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cuzco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Mar 1654BornBuenos Aires
13 Jan 171661.8AppointedBishop of Cuzco, Peru
1717²62.8Ordained BishopBishop of Cuzco, Peru
9 Oct 172470.5DiedBishop of Cuzco, Peru

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gabriel de Arregui y Gutiérrez:
Bishop Gabriel de Arregui y Gutiérrez O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Cuzco

  • a bishop for 7.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 179
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1717, Number 21
  • b/c2: CB, 30 Aug 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 1 Sep 2015