Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rodolfo Bufano

Deceased

Bishop of San Justo, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1931Born
18 Sep 195423.5Ordained PriestPriest
16 May 197847.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Justo, Argentina
16 May 197847.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Aquae in Mauretania
21 Jul 197847.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aquae in Mauretania
27 Mar 198049.1AppointedBishop of Chascomús, Argentina
16 Apr 198251.1AppointedBishop of San Justo, Argentina
26 Jun 198251.3InstalledBishop of San Justo, Argentina
5 Nov 199059.7DiedBishop of San Justo, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Rodolfo Bufano
Bishop Rodolfo Bufano (born , died ) Bishop of San Justo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuenos Aires

  • a priest for 36.1 years
  • a bishop for 12.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018