Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benito Lué y Riega

Deceased

Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1753Born
9 Aug 180249.4AppointedBishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
29 May 180350.2Ordained BishopBishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
22 Mar 181259.0DiedBishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Benito Lué y Riega
Bishop Benito Lué y Riega (born , died ) Bishop of Buenos Aires

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLastres, Spain

  • a bishop for 8.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1803, Number 15
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 378
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 123, Number 655

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jun 2017