Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rafael Andreu Guerrero

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of La Plata o Charcas

Titular Bishop of Epiphania in Cilicia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jul 1760BornTarifa, Spain
179635.4Ordained PriestPriest
26 Mar 180443.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia
26 Mar 180443.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Epiphania in Cilicia
24 Feb 181049.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Epiphania in Cilicia
1 May 181958.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Rafael Andreu Guerrero:
Bishop Rafael Andreu Guerrero (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of La Plata o Charcas

  • a priest for 23.3 years
  • a bishop for 9.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1804
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1810, Number 1
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,921
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 188
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 129, Number 688

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015