Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio de Azcona Umberto

Deceased

Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Nov 1618Born
9 May 167657.5SelectedBishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
19 Oct 167657.9ConfirmedBishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
Jun 1677²58.5Ordained BishopBishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
19 Feb 170081.2DiedBishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio de Azcona Umberto
Bishop Antonio de Azcona Umberto (born , died ) Bishop of Buenos Aires

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEstella, Spain

  • a bishop for 22.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 390
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 215, Number 1,341
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1677, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018