Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cristóbal de Aresti Martínez de Aguilar, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1578²Born
10 Oct 15857.7ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
12 Feb 162951.1AppointedBishop of Paraguay (o Ssma Assunzione)
3 Dec 163557.9AppointedBishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
1641²63.0DiedBishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cristóbal de Aresti Martínez de Aguilar
Bishop Cristóbal de Aresti Martínez de Aguilar O.S.B. (born 1578, died 1641) Bishop of Buenos Aires

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValladolid, Spain

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 98, and Page 344
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 152, Number 965
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1629, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018