Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José María Bottaro y Hers, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Buenos Aires

Titular Archbishop of Macra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Oct 1859BornSan Pedro
25 Sep 188626.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
9 Sep 192666.9AppointedArchbishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
5 Dec 192667.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
20 Oct 193273.0ResignedArchbishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
20 Oct 193273.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Macra
11 May 193575.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Buenos Aires, Argentina

MicroData Summary for José María Bottaro y Hers:
Archbishop José María Bottaro y Hers O.F.M. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Buenos Aires

  • a priest for 48.6 years
  • a bishop for 8.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1926, Number 85

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013