Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cristóbal de la Mancha y Velazco, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Buenos Aires


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1600¹BornLima
31 Aug 164141.6SelectedBishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
13 Jan 164242.0ConfirmedBishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
30 Nov 164545.9Ordained BishopBishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
4 Jul 167373.5DiedBishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cristóbal de la Mancha y Velazco:
Bishop Cristóbal de la Mancha y Velazco O.P. (born 1600, died ) Bishop of Buenos Aires

  • a bishop for 27.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1645, Number 47
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 344

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015