Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marcelo Sánchez Sorondo

Chancellor Emeritus of the Pontifical Academy of Sciences

Titular Bishop of Forum Novum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1942 Born
7 Dec 196826.2Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
5 Oct 199856.0AppointedChancellor of the Pontifical Academy of Sciences
5 Oct 199856.0AppointedChancellor of the Pontifical Academy of Social Sciences
23 Feb 200158.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Forum Novum
19 Mar 200158.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Forum Novum
5 Jun 202279.7CeasedChancellor of the Pontifical Academy of Sciences
5 Jun 202279.7CeasedChancellor of the Pontifical Academy of Social Sciences

MicroData Summary
Marcelo Sánchez Sorondo
Bishop Marcelo Sánchez Sorondo
(born )
Chancellor Emeritus of Sciences

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuenos Aires, Archdiocese of Buenos Aires, Argentina
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Bishop through the Pontifical Academy of Sciences.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Number 13,939

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.2, 10 May 2025; Data: 12 May 2025