Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Antonio de la Torre

Deceased

Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1705Born
23 Mar 175651.2SelectedBishop of Paraguay (o Ssma Assunzione)
24 May 175651.3ConfirmedBishop of Paraguay (o Ssma Assunzione)
25 Jul 175752.5Ordained BishopBishop of Paraguay (o Ssma Assunzione)
14 Jun 176257.4AppointedBishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
21 Sep 176257.7InstalledBishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
20 Oct 177671.8DiedBishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Manuel Antonio de la Torre
Bishop Manuel Antonio de la Torre (born , died ) Bishop of Buenos Aires

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAntillo de Campos, Spain
Ordained BishopBuenos Aires, Diocese of Buenos Aires

  • a bishop for 19.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 75, Number 370
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 103, and Page 417
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1757, Number 23
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 42, Number 2,773
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 48, Number 3,282

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast