Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego Salguero de Cabrera

Deceased

Bishop of Arequipa, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1710¹Born
18 Jul 176353.5AppointedBishop of Arequipa, Peru
2 Sep 176454.6Ordained BishopBishop of Arequipa, Peru
2 Dec 176959.9DiedBishop of Arequipa, Peru

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Diego Salguero de Cabrera
Bishop Diego Salguero de Cabrera (born 1710, died ) Bishop of Arequipa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCórdoba
Ordained BishopSanta Fe, Argentina

  • a bishop for 5.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 98
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1764, Number 35
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 52, Number 3,629

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast