Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel de Abad e Illanar, O. Praem. †

Deceased

Bishop of Arequipa, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Dec 1713Born
15 Sep 176248.7SelectedBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
22 Nov 176248.9ConfirmedBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
2 Sep 176450.7Ordained BishopBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
17 Jun 177157.5AppointedBishop of Arequipa, Peru
1 Feb 178066.1DiedBishop of Arequipa, Peru

MicroData Summary for Manuel de Abad e Illanar (VIAF: 49151128)
Bishop Manuel de Abad e Illanar O. Praem. (born , died ) Bishop of Arequipa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValladolid, Diocese of Valladolid, Spain

  • a bishop for 15.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 98, and Page 420
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 81, Number 408
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1764, Number 34
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 48, Number 3,283
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 83, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast