Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Amancio Francisco Benítez Candia

Bishop of Benjamín Aceval, Paraguay


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Feb 1973 Born
24 Apr 199926.2Ordained PriestPriest of Villarrica del Espíritu Santo, Paraguay
16 Jun 201845.3AppointedBishop of Benjamín Aceval, Paraguay
4 Aug 201845.4Ordained BishopBishop of Benjamín Aceval, Paraguay

MicroData Summary for Amancio Francisco Benítez Candia
Bishop Amancio Francisco Benítez Candia (born ) Bishop of Benjamín Aceval

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCerroguy-Itapé
Ordained BishopOutside, near, Santa Rosa de Lima, Cathedral, Benjamín Aceval, Diocese of Benjamín Aceval

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Benjamín Aceval.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Jun 2018
  • ob: CB, 29 Jun 2018
  • c2: CB, 2 Aug 2018
  • c34: CB, 4 Aug 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 237, Number 19,831

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast