Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cándido Cárdenas Villalba

Bishop Emeritus of Benjamín Aceval, Paraguay


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Oct 1941 Born
12 Jul 197028.7Ordained PriestPriest
6 Jul 199856.7AppointedBishop of Benjamín Aceval, Paraguay
20 Sep 199856.9Ordained BishopBishop of Benjamín Aceval, Paraguay
16 Jun 201876.7RetiredBishop of Benjamín Aceval, Paraguay

MicroData Summary for Cándido Cárdenas Villalba
Bishop Cándido Cárdenas Villalba (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Benjamín Aceval

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSupucia
Ordained BishopCathedral, Benjamín Aceval, Diocese of Benjamín Aceval

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Benjamín Aceval.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Number 13,431
  • r: Bollettino, 16 Jun 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 7 Aug 2018

Quantcast