Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel Ángel Cabello Almada

Bishop of Concepción (Santissima Concezione) en Paraguay


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Sep 1965 BornPiribebuy
15 Sep 199126.0Ordained PriestPriest of Caacupé, Paraguay
11 Jul 201347.9AppointedBishop of Concepción (Santissima Concezione) en Paraguay
15 Sep 201348.0Ordained BishopBishop of Concepción (Santissima Concezione) en Paraguay
22 Sep 201348.0InstalledBishop of Concepción (Santissima Concezione) en Paraguay

MicroData Summary for Miguel Ángel Cabello Almada:
Bishop Miguel Ángel Cabello Almada (born ) Bishop of Concepción (Santissima Concezione) en Paraguay

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Concepción (Santissima Concezione) en Paraguay.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Jul 2013
  • ob: CB, 11 Jul 2013
  • c2+: CB, 13 Sep 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 14 Sep 2013